U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fideity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc. and Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00127
Filed: January 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #16 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/21/2021. Motions due by 11/22/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/11/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 11, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust. (Robbins, Lindsay)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #9 Motion to Remand to State Court, #10 Motion for Attorney Fees (First Request). Responses due by 3/30/2021. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Proposed Order re #9 Motion to Remand to State Court, #10 Motion for Attorney Fees by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Lau, Sophia)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond Re: #1 Petition for Removal. Fideity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc., Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., and Fidelity National Title Insurance Company answer due 4/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendants Fideity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc., Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
February 25, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust re #1 Petition for Removal,,. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. served on 2/17/2021. (Robbins, Lindsay)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees re #9 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust. Responses due by 3/9/2021. (Robbins, Lindsay)
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust. Responses due by 3/9/2021. (Robbins, Lindsay)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust re #1 Petition for Removal,,. Fideity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc. served on 2/9/2021. (Robbins, Lindsay)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust re #1 Petition for Removal,,. Fidelity National Title Insurance Company served on 2/9/2021. (Robbins, Lindsay)
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Robbins, Lindsay)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Case by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/25/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/9/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 25, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DRS)
January 24, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Nevada Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-828245-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6341556) by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 4/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 (Complaint), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure), #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Gizer, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fideity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?