Cowley v. DePuy Synthes Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Adam Ian Cowley
Defendant: Chad Arthurs, DePuy Synthes Inc. and Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00129
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #19 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/18/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 18, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #18 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/11/2022. Motions due by 3/14/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/18/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 17, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Entry of Protective Order by Defendant Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Protective Order) (McCoy, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Filing 18 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. (McCoy, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Stipulation to Withdraw #6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation of Dismissal of Chad Arthurs and Depuy Synthes, Inc without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Stipulation to Withdraw #4 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 16, 2021 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT Concerning Removal by Defendants Chad Arthurs, DePuy Synthes Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. (McCoy, Robert)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and Order to Withdraw Defendant Chad Arthurs re #6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Chad Arthurs, DePuy Synthes Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. (McCoy, Robert)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and Order to Withdraw re #4 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Chad Arthurs, DePuy Synthes Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. (McCoy, Robert)
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Chad Arthurs and Depuy Synthes, Inc. Without Prejudice by Defendants Chad Arthurs, DePuy Synthes Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. (McCoy, Robert)
February 10, 2021 Filing 10 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Chad Arthurs, DePuy Synthes Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Minute Order re Statement and Report due dates) (McCoy, Robert)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Chad Arthurs. (McCoy, Robert)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #4 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Chad Arthurs, DePuy Synthes Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. Replies due by 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Declaration of Chad Arthurs) (McCoy, Robert)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Adam Ian Cowley. Replies due by 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Minucci, Matthew)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 Withdrawn by #17 Order. MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Chad Arthurs. Responses due by 2/15/2021. (McCoy, Robert) Modified on 2/17/2021 (DRS).
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (ECF No. 1-2) filed by DePuy Synthes Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/18/2021.(McCoy, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 Withdrawn by #15 Order. MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Plaintiff Adam Ian Cowley. Responses due by 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Minucci, Matthew) Modified on 2/17/2021 (DRS).
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/26/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/10/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 26, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRS)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Chad Arthurs, DePuy Synthes Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson, Other Affiliate DePuy Synthes Inc. for Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.; Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Chad Arthurs, DePuy Synthes Inc. added. (McCoy, Robert)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, District of Nevada, Case Number A-20-826546-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6343151) by Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy Synthes Inc., Chad Arthurs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex B - Summons - DePuy Synthes Sales Inc., #4 Exhibit Ex C - Summons - Chad Arthurs, #5 Exhibit Ex D - Summons - DePuy Synthes Inc., #6 Exhibit Ex E - Affidavit of Service to DePuy Synthes Sales Inc., #7 Exhibit Ex F - Affidavit of Service to Chad Arthurs) (McCoy, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowley v. DePuy Synthes Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Arthurs
Represented By: Sihomara L. Graves
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Inc.
Represented By: Sihomara L. Graves
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Sihomara L. Graves
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Ian Cowley
Represented By: Matthew David Minucci
Represented By: Robert W. Cottle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?