Allison v. Piekarski et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Allison
Defendant: N Neshewat and Z Piekarski
Case Number: 2:2021cv00147
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff must file a notice with his current address with the Court by 3/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Attempted - Not Known re #3 Order, addressed to Ronald Allison. No new address available; Unable to remail. (MR)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable/Attempted Not Known re #2 Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas addressed to Ronald Allison. No new address available; Unable to re-mail. (DRS)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court send plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner, as well as the accompanying information form and instructions for filing the application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty days from the date of this order, plaintiff must either: (1) file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis, on the correct form with complete financial attachments in compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(a); or (2) pay the full $402 fee for a civil action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRS)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DRS)
January 25, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allison v. Piekarski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Neshewat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z Piekarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?