Minden et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael Minden and Theresa Minden
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00151
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to #16 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Michael Minden, Theresa Minden. Replies due by 4/2/2021. (Kleiman, Kerry)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/26/2021. (Hansard, Wade)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying #6 Motion to Dismiss as Moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Michael Minden. (Kelley, Michael)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michael Minden. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kelley, Michael)
February 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #11 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (DKJ)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Michael Minden. No changes to parties. (Kelley, Michael)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #6 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/26/2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney I. Scott Bogatz on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Minden. (Bogatz, I. Scott)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 First STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff to Respond to re #6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Michael Minden. (Kelley, Michael)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael S. Kelley on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Minden. (Kelley, Michael)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 2/19/2021. (Hansard, Wade)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/28/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/12/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hansard, Wade)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Hansard, Wade)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Jusicial District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-20-820464-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6348039) by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hansard, Wade) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minden et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Minden
Represented By: I. Scott Bogatz
Represented By: Michael S. Kelley
Represented By: Kerry Elizabeth Kleiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Minden
Represented By: I. Scott Bogatz
Represented By: Michael S. Kelley
Represented By: Kerry Elizabeth Kleiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Represented By: Wade M. Hansard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?