League v. NV Dept. of Corrections
Plaintiff: Major E. League
Defendant: NV Dept. of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2021cv00239
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff shall submit a complaint on or before 4/19/2021. Plaintiff shall also pay filing fee in full or file proper Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Forms for complaint and IFP attached herein for dissemination through law library. Plaintiff is also to receive a copy of his Emergency Injunction, also attached herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Emergency Injunction for dissemination through law library, #2 42:1983 Complaint form, #3 Inmate In Forma Pauperis application)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 16, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (EDS)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (AB)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Emergency Injunction) (AB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: League v. NV Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major E. League
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NV Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?