U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-20 v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-20
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Chicago Title Agency of Nevada and Chicago Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00257
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/8/2021. ORDER STAYING BRIEFING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the unopposed motion #16 to stay briefing on defendants' motions to dismiss [12-14] pending the ruling on the motion for remand #9 is GRANTED, and the stipulation to extend the time to respond to the motions to dismiss #23 is denied as moot. The deadline to respond to the motions to dismiss [12-14] is extended to 14 days after the court issues its ruling on the motion to remand #9 , if necessary. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD)
April 8, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court, #10 Motion for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Robbins, Lindsay)
April 6, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #14 Motion to Dismiss, #12 Motion to Dismiss, #13 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-20. (Robbins, Lindsay)
April 2, 2021 Filing 22 NON-OPPOSITION to #16 Motion, by Defendants Chicago Title Agency of Nevada, Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.. (Sinclair, Kevin)
April 1, 2021 Filing 21 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #20 Response by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chicago Title Insurance Companys Insurer license, #2 Exhibit B - Chicago Title of Nevada, Inc.s license, #3 Exhibit C - License No. 2214 issued to Chicago Title of Nevada, Inc. by the Nevada Division of Insurance) (Gizer, Scott)
April 1, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court, #10 Motion for Attorney Fees by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. Replies due by 4/8/2021. (Gizer, Scott)
April 1, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #17 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/15/2021. Motions due by 12/15/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 1, 2021 Filing 17 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-20. (Robbins, Lindsay)
March 26, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Briefing re #14 Motion to Dismiss, #12 Motion to Dismiss, #13 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-20. Responses due by 4/9/2021. (Robbins, Lindsay)
March 23, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Chicago Title Agency of Nevada, Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent FNTG HOLDINGS, LLC for Chicago Title Agency of Nevada, Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. added. (Sinclair, Kevin)
March 23, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Chicago Title Agency of Nevada. Responses due by 4/6/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.. Responses due by 4/6/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacob Ancona, Esq.) (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. Responses due by 4/6/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/7/2021. (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 22, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-20 re #1 Petition for Removal,,. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. served on 3/11/2021. (Robbins, Lindsay)
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees re #9 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-20. Responses due by 4/1/2021. (Robbins, Lindsay)
March 18, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-20. Responses due by 4/1/2021. (Robbins, Lindsay)
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-20 re #1 Petition for Removal,,. Chicago Title Insurance Company served on 3/4/2021. (Robbins, Lindsay)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-20 re #1 Petition for Removal,,. Chicago Title Agency of Nevada served on 3/3/2021. (Robbins, Lindsay)
March 2, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Chicago Title Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent FNTG HOLDINGS, LLC, Corporate Parent Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. for Chicago Title Insurance Company added. (Sinclair, Kevin)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Case by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-20 that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-20 added. (Robbins, Lindsay)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/17/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/4/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 17, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Nevada Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-829495-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6371502) by Chicago Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 5/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 (Complaint), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure), #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Gizer, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-20 v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Agency of Nevada
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-20
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?