Hankins v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Hankins
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00274
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/18/2021. Motions due by 9/17/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/13/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 13, 2021 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Douglas Griffith is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (DKJ)
April 13, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 4/13/2021 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries; Pla Counsel: Justin Dewey; Def Counsel: Jonathan Carlson and Douglas Griffith; Recording start and end times: 11:04 - 11:11; Courtroom: 3A; This hearing is conducted via video conferencing. The court canvasses and hears representations from the parties. Counsel advise the court that paragraph "J" in the proposed discovery plan and scheduling order #9 is a typo and the parties are not requesting a status conference prior to the entry of the discovery plan and scheduling order. ORDERED the court approves the proposed stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order #9 and will file it separately on the docket. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Richard Lazenby and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan Carlson. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/7/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Michael Cutler and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan Carlson. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/7/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Douglas Griffith for United Airlines, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan W Carlson. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/7/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 6, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Richard Lazenby and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan Carlson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6435751) by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Carlson, Jonathan)
April 6, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael Cutler and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan Carlson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6435749) by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Carlson, Jonathan)
April 6, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Douglas Griffith and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan Carlson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6435740) by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Carlson, Jonathan)
March 25, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/25/2021. By Deputy Clerk: J. Ries. ORDERED status check hearing is set for April 13, 2021, at 11:00 a.m., RE: Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order #9 . Status check hearing will be conducted via video conferencing and the parties will receive an invitation to appear. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR)
March 24, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #8 , #9 . Attorney Justin L. Dewey is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (SLD)
March 24, 2021 Filing 9 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Carlson, Jonathan)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Carlson, Jonathan)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Carlson, Jonathan)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by United Airlines, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/12/2021.(Carlson, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/19/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/6/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Carlson, Jonathan)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by United Airlines, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate United Airlines Holdings, nc. for United Airlines, Inc. added. (Carlson, Jonathan)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-828351-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6374971) by United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carlson, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 19, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hankins v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Represented By: Richard Lazenby
Represented By: Doug Griffith
Represented By: Michael Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Hankins
Represented By: Bruce D. Tingey
Represented By: Justin Dewey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?