Edging v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Michael Edging
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00322
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 31, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Casey Shpall and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric W. Swanis. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/25/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 24, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Casey Shpall and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric W. Swanis (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6419318) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Stipulation to substitute Eric W. Swanis as counsel of record in this action in placeand stead of Richard B. North for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated added. (Swanis, Eric)
March 8, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Substitute Attorneys by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
February 25, 2021 Filing 11 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 25, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/25/2021. This action was received on* 2/25/2021* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* District of Arizona* and assigned case number 2:21-cv-00322-RFB-BNW. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Verified Petition due by 3/11/2021. Joint Status Report due by 3/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-02960. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (MR)
February 25, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Nevada via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 *AMENDED By Doc. #8 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *VACATED By Doc. #6 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21003 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/26/19. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
September 7, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Michael Edging. Document entered in wrong case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
September 7, 2017 Filing 3 *NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Gayland Foster on behalf of Michael Edging. (Foster, Shawn) *Document filed in the wrong case. Attorney noticed to re-file in correct case on 9/7/2017 (LSP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
August 31, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-02960-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
August 31, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14603198 filed by Michael Edging. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edging v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Casey Shpall
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Casey Shpall
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Edging
Represented By: Shawn Gayland Foster
Represented By: Grant L Davis
Represented By: Valley Renshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?