Griego v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Nestor Griego
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00325
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
2 Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Casey Shpall for C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and approving Designation of Local Counsel Eric W. Swanis. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/12/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Douglass A. Kreis to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition was due by 3/11/2021. (no image attached) (MMM)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Casey Shpall and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric W. Swanis (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6419220) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation to Substitute Attorneys. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated added. (Swanis, Eric)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION to Substitute Attorneys by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:21-cv-325-JAD-BNW. (no image attached) (AF)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/25/2021. This action was received on* 2/25/2021* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* District of Arizona* and assigned case number 2:21-cv-00325-JAD-DJA. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Verified Petition due by 3/11/2021. Joint Status Report due by 3/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-00929. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (MR)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Nevada via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 20981 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/9/19. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-929-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16526507 filed by Nestor Griego. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griego v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Casey Shpall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Casey Shpall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nestor Griego
Represented By: DOUGLASS ALAN KREIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?