Penkowicz v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Deiter Penkowicz
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00331
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
2 Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Kelly Chermack and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mike Hieu Thien Nguyen. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/14/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 13, 2021 Filing 18 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Chermack and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mike H. T. Nguyen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6445776) by Plaintiff Deiter Penkowicz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Nguyen, Mike)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #13 Stipulation to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying #15 Motion to Substitute Attorney without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/2/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 30, 2021 Filing 15 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Mike H.T. Nguyen in for Attorney Arati C. Furness & Matthew McCarley by Plaintiff Deiter Penkowicz. (Nguyen, Mike)
March 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Kelly Chermack to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/12/2021. (no image attached) (DKJ)
March 29, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION to and [Proposed] Order to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
March 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mike Hieu Thien Nguyen on behalf of Plaintiff Deiter Penkowicz. (Nguyen, Mike)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation to Substitute Attorneys. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REASSIGNMENT ORDER. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:21-cv-00331-JAD-BNW. Re: #8 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/11/2021. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CH)
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated added. (Swanis, Eric)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Substitute Attorneys by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/26/2021. This action was received on* 2/25/2021* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Arizona* and assigned case number 2:21-cv-00331-JAD-NJK. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Verified Petition due by 3/12/2021. Joint Status Report due by 3/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Arati C Furness and Matthew Ryan McCarley to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/12/2021. (no image attached) (DRS)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03452. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 26, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (DRS)
February 25, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Nevada via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/26/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/26/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/26/2021.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-3452-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/26/2021.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16955140 filed by Deiter Penkowicz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/26/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penkowicz v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deiter Penkowicz
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Kelly Chermack
Represented By: Mike Hieu Thien Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?