Allen v. Vocatus, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Erin Allen
Defendant: Shamoun's, LLC and Vocatus, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00377
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #11 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/28/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Governing the Confidentiality of Information and Documents by Defendants Shamoun's, LLC, Vocatus, LLC. (Howard, Amy) Modified on 4/28/2021 (EDS).
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #8 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 9/1/2021. Motions due by 10/1/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/9/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Shamoun's, LLC, Vocatus, LLC. (Howard, Amy)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Removal by Defendants Shamoun's, LLC, Vocatus, LLC. (Howard, Amy)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Shamoun's, LLC, Vocatus, LLC. (Howard, Amy)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Shamoun's, LLC, Vocatus, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/26/2021.(Howard, Amy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified to remove duplicative text on 3/12/2021 (MMM).
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/5/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/20/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Shamoun's, LLC, Vocatus, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Howard, Amy)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-827768-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6394748) by Shamoun's, LLC, Vocatus, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summonses, #4 Exhibit C - Affidavits of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Howard, Amy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 5, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Vocatus, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Allen
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shamoun's, LLC
Represented By: Amy L. Howard
Represented By: Suzanne L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vocatus, LLC
Represented By: Amy L. Howard
Represented By: Suzanne L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?