U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee and U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc. and Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00388
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation to Stay Case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Stay Case Pending Wells Fargo II Appeal by Defendants Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc., Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Fees re #6 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. Responses due by 4/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Robbins, Lindsay)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. Responses due by 4/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Robbins, Lindsay)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by U.S. Bank National Association. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Robbins, Lindsay)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Case by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/9/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/24/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 9, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Nevada Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-830671-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6397477) by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 6/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 (Complaint, pp. 1-700), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Complaint, pp. 701-916), #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 (Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure), #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Gizer, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?