Bank of America, N.A. v. North American Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00415
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation to Stay Case. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 4/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Stay Case by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bank of America, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A. added. (Robbins, Lindsay)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Case by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/11/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/26/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 11, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by North American Title Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent U.S. Home Corporation, Corporate Parent Lennar Corporation, Corporate Parent States Title Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent CalAtlantic Title Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Lennar Financial Services, LLC, Corporate Parent LFS Holding Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Saslaw-Simkoff Revocable Trust, Corporate Parent Foundation Capital VIII, L.P. for North American Title Insurance Company added. (Sinclair, Kevin)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-830782-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6402446) by North American Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 6/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. North American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?