Christensen Law Offices, LLC et al v. Christensen et al
Plaintiff: Christensen Law Offices, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company, Bruce W. Kelley and Winner & Sherrod, LTD.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Eric Christensen and Elmina Ann Christensen
Case Number: 2:2021cv00424
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Remand to State Court, and DENYING #33 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court further Denies, without prejudice #5 Motion to Dismiss #7 Motion to Dismiss and #10 Motion to Stay Case. The Clerk shall REMAND this case back to the Eighth Judicial District. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, Certified order and docket sheet to 8JD - DRS)
April 20, 2021 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff Christensen Law Offices, LLC. (Christensen, Thomas)
April 20, 2021 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Christensen Law Offices, LLC. (Christensen, Thomas)
April 19, 2021 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Dismiss,, by ThirdParty Defendant Winner & Sherrod, LTD.. (Rogers, Stephen)
April 16, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Objection to Evidentiary Offerings by Government Employees Insurance Company re #23 Response, #27 Response. (Hansard, Wade)
April 16, 2021 Filing 35 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #34 Reply by ThirdParty Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hansard, Wade)
April 16, 2021 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss, by ThirdParty Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company. (Hansard, Wade)
April 16, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Christensen Law Offices, LLC. Responses due by 4/30/2021. (Christensen, Thomas)
April 13, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Dismiss,, by Third Party Plaintiffs Elmina Ann Christensen, Eric Christensen. Replies due by 4/20/2021. (Nelson, Erven)
April 13, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Christensen Law Offices, LLC. Replies due by 4/20/2021. (Christensen, Thomas)
April 13, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Stay Case by ThirdParty Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company. Replies due by 4/20/2021. (Hansard, Wade)
April 13, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by ThirdParty Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company. Replies due by 4/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Hansard, Wade)
April 12, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss, by ThirdParty Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company. (Hansard, Wade)
April 9, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Dismiss, by Third Party Plaintiffs Elmina Ann Christensen, Eric Christensen. Replies due by 4/16/2021. (Nelson, Erven)
April 9, 2021 Filing 26 JOINDER to #23 Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Third Party Plaintiffs Elmina Ann Christensen, Eric Christensen. (Nelson, Erven) Modified on 4/9/2021 to link to underlying motion (MMM).
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #5 Motion to Dismiss, Responses due by 4/13/2021. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 5, 2021 Filing 24 JOINDER to #23 Response by Third Party Plaintiffs Elmina Ann Christensen, Eric Christensen. (Nelson, Erven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Christensen Law Offices, LLC. Replies due by 4/12/2021. (Christensen, Thomas)
April 3, 2021 Filing 22 JOINDER to #10 Motion to Stay Case by Third Party Plaintiffs Elmina Ann Christensen, Eric Christensen. (Nelson, Erven)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Re: #7 Motion to Dismiss; Responses due by 4/9/2021. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 1, 2021 Filing 20 JOINDER to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Third Party Plaintiffs Elmina Ann Christensen, Eric Christensen. (Nelson, Erven)
April 1, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #7 Motion to Dismiss, by Third Party Plaintiffs Elmina Ann Christensen, Eric Christensen. (Nelson, Erven)
March 31, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #11 Stipulation by Third Party Plaintiffs Elmina Ann Christensen, Eric Christensen. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Nelson, Erven)
March 31, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Christensen Law Offices, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Christensen, Thomas)
March 31, 2021 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Thomas Christensen advised to review LR IA 10-2: Required Format for Filed Documents. Previously filed documents #8 , #9 , and #10 missing the required information. Please include the required information on future filings. No further action required. Do not refile documents. (no image attached) (SLD)
March 31, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #8 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) by attorney Thomas Christensen. For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #8 as a Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs to be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing a separate document for each request or purpose. (no image attached) (SLD)
March 31, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #10 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff Christensen Law Offices, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Christensen, Thomas)
March 31, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 3/31/2021 Re: #11 Stipulation.Attorney Action required - Attorney Erven Nelson is advised to file a properly formatted proposed order in accordance with LR IA 10-2, using the correct event Notice of Corrected Image and properly link newly filed Notice to document #11 pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) and LR IC 2-2(d). (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 30, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Elmina Ann Christensen, Eric Christensen. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Nelson, Erven)
March 30, 2021 Filing 11 VIEW Corrected Image #18 re: STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #5 Motion to Dismiss,, by Third Party Plaintiffs Elmina Ann Christensen, Eric Christensen. (Nelson, Erven) Modified on 4/1/2021 (SLD).
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 VIEW Corrected Image #14 re: MOTION to Stay Case by Plaintiff Christensen Law Offices, LLC. (Christensen, Thomas) Modified on 3/31/2021 (SLD).
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Christensen Law Offices, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Christensen, Thomas)
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 VIEW Corrected Image #17 re: MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal, by Plaintiff Christensen Law Offices, LLC. Responses due by 4/13/2021. (Christensen, Thomas) Modified on 4/1/2021 (SLD).
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss, and/or Sever/Remand Non-Diverse Claims by ThirdParty Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company. Responses due by 4/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Hansard, Wade) Modified tect on 3/23/2021 (SLD).
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bruce W. Kelley, Winner & Sherrod, LTD.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rogers, Stephen)
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, by Third Party Defendants Bruce W. Kelley, Winner & Sherrod, LTD.. Responses due by 3/30/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Rogers, Stephen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 3/16/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/31/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 16, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Government Employees Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Government Employees Insurance Company added. (Hansard, Wade)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ThirdParty Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company. (Hansard, Wade)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Jusicial District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-20-811004-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6406105) by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hansard, Wade) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christensen Law Offices, LLC et al v. Christensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Wade M. Hansard
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Represented By: Renee Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bruce W. Kelley
Represented By: Stephen H. Rogers
Represented By: Charles Michalek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Winner & Sherrod, LTD.
Represented By: Stephen H. Rogers
Represented By: Charles Michalek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Eric Christensen
Represented By: Erven Tebbs Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Elmina Ann Christensen
Represented By: Erven Tebbs Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christensen Law Offices, LLC
Represented By: Thomas F. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?