Stewart v. Ahern Rentals Inc.
Plaintiff: Secretary of Labor Milton Al Stewart
Defendant: Ahern Rentals Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00441
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Milton Al Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of OSHA Regional Investigator Jared Klein, #2 Declaration of Norman E. Garcia) (Garcia, Norman)
April 23, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Ahern Rentals Inc.. Replies due by 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit W2s, #3 Exhibit Spreadsheet) (Silvera, Darryl)
April 16, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #17 Certificate of Interested Parties by Defendant Ahern Rentals Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Silvera, Darryl)
April 16, 2021 Filing 17 VIEW #18 corrected image re CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ahern Rentals Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Silvera, Darryl) Modified on 4/16/2021 (DKJ).
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER IT IS ORDERED that the defendant shall file a response to the motion for preliminary injunction, if it has any, by 4/23/2021. The plaintiff may file a reply within seven days of the response. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Darryl J. Silvera for Ahern Rentals Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Nazario Jureidini. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/12/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 9, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #9 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Ahern Rentals Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Jureidini, Nazario)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Myers for Ahern Rentals Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Nazario Jureidini. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/9/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 8, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Ahern Rentals Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/23/2021.(Jureidini, Nazario) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #10 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Ahern Rentals Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Jureidini, Nazario)
April 7, 2021 Filing 10 VIEW #11 corrected image re MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael H. Myers and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nazario Jureidini (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6437496) by Defendant Ahern Rentals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Jureidini, Nazario) Modified on 4/8/2021 (DKJ).
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 VIEW #14 corrected image re MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Darryl J. Silvera and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nazario Jureidini (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6437468) by Defendant Ahern Rentals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Jureidini, Nazario) Modified on 4/9/2021 (DKJ).
March 25, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Milton Al Stewart. Ahern Rentals Inc. served on 3/18/2021. (Garcia, Norman)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case was randomly reassigned to Judge Dawson in error and is randomly reassigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:21-cv-00441-APG-VCF. (no image attached) (DKJ)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:21-cv-00441-KJD-VCF. (no image attached) (DKJ)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/17/2021. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron S Blazevich. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ahern Rentals Inc. re #1 Complaint,,. (DRS)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Milton Al Stewart. Responses due by 3/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Garcia, Norman)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ahern Rentals Inc. by Milton Al Stewart. Proof of service due by 6/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons) (Garcia, Norman) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 17, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. ***Emergency motion previously filed in case.*** (Chambers to be notified by email - DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Ahern Rentals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahern Rentals Inc.
Represented By: Michael H Myers
Represented By: Darryl J Silvera
Represented By: Nazario Jureidini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secretary of Labor Milton Al Stewart
Represented By: Norman E. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?