Alexander et al v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Robert Roy Alexander and Sarah Elizabeth Alexander
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation and Valley Contax Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00509
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/28/2022. Motions due by 5/27/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/28/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 28, 2021 Filing 9 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Robert Roy Alexander, Sarah Elizabeth Alexander. (Ganier, Ashley)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Robert Roy Alexander, Sarah Elizabeth Alexander. (Ganier, Ashley)
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Carranza, Edgar)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Costco Wholesale Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Carranza, Edgar)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Robert Roy Alexander, Sarah Elizabeth Alexander. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ganier, Ashley)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 ERRATA to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit) (Carranza, Edgar)
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/29/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/13/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-823882-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6424145) by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carranza, Edgar) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 29, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander et al v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Edgar Carranza
Represented By: Jacquelyn Michelle Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Contax Inc
Represented By: Alan W Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Roy Alexander
Represented By: Ashley Marie Ganier
Represented By: Joseph J. Wirth
Represented By: Bradley S. Mainor
Represented By: Joseph W. Guindy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Elizabeth Alexander
Represented By: Ashley Marie Ganier
Represented By: Joseph J. Wirth
Represented By: Bradley S. Mainor
Represented By: Joseph W. Guindy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?