Pasia v. Attorney General of the U.S.
Petitioner: Moli Pasia
Respondent: Attorney General of the U.S.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00550
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 RECEIPT of Payment: $5.00, receipt number NVLAS075401. (MR)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that, within 45 days of the date of this order, petitioner make the necessary arrangements to pay the $5.00 filing fee OR file an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, accompanied by a signed financial certificate and a statement of his inmate account. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Inmate IFP Instructions/Form to P - MR)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Attorney General of the U.S. has been received and assigned case number 2:21-cv-00550-GMN-VCF. (MR)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Envelope) (MR)
April 2, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pasia v. Attorney General of the U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Moli Pasia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?