United States of America for the use and benefit of Casas Construction v. Sierra Range Construction et al
Plaintiff: Casas Construction
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company and Sierra Range Construction
Counter Defendant: Daniel J. Casas
Case Number: 2:2021cv00573
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sierra Range Construction. Daniel J. Casas waiver sent on 5/10/2021, answer due 7/9/2021. (Yarmy, Steven) Modified text and set Answer deadline on 5/12/2021 (SLD).
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by William J. Braun and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Steven L. Yarmy. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/30/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 29, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Sierra Range Construction that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Yarmy, Steven)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 COUNTERCLAIM against Casas Construction, Daniel J. Casas by Sierra Range Construction. (Yarmy, Steven)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Sierra Range Construction. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/13/2021.(Yarmy, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by William J. Braun, Esq. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Steven L. Yarmy, Esq. (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6468016) by Defendants Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Sierra Range Construction. (Yarmy, Steven)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casas Construction. Sierra Range Construction served on 4/9/2021. (Rutar Mullins, Gwen)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casas Construction. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company served on 4/12/2021. (Rutar Mullins, Gwen) Modified text on 4/27/2021 (EDS).
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Sierra Range Construction re #1 Complaint. (HAM)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by United States of America for the use and benefit of Casas Construction. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rutar Mullins, Gwen)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6438065) by United States of America for the use and benefit of Casas Construction. Proof of service due by 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rutar Mullins, Gwen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 7, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the use and benefit of Casas Construction v. Sierra Range Construction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven L. Yarmy
Represented By: William J. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Range Construction
Represented By: Steven L. Yarmy
Represented By: William J. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casas Construction
Represented By: Gwen Rutar Mullins
Represented By: Kirill V Mikhaylov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Daniel J. Casas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?