Hurvitz v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest et al
Plaintiff: Kita Hurvitz
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00617
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Party Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. terminated pursuant to #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (DKJ)
June 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Kita Hurvitz. to dismiss Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., only (Ream, James)
May 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Petition for Removal* in this action was filed on* 4/14/2021.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc..* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 6/27/2021. (EDS)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation Re: #9 Motion for Declaratory Relief. Responses due by 7/5/2021. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
May 25, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory Relief re #9 Motion by Defendant Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Brenner, Darren)
May 21, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/5/2021.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. filed by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest.(Brenner, Darren) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Declaratory Relief by Plaintiff Kita Hurvitz. Responses due by 6/3/2021. (Ream, James)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING REMOVED CASE by Defendant Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Robbins, Lindsay)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Robbins, Lindsay)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/22/2021. Good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that #4 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs complaint by May 21, 2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group for Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest added. (Brenner, Darren)
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Brenner, Darren)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/14/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/29/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Nevada Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-826783-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6448028) by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. Proof of service due by 3/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brenner, Darren) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 14, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurvitz v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kita Hurvitz
Represented By: James J Ream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?