Colas-Rodriguez et al v. Lyft, Inc.
Plaintiff: Yunaisy Garbey, Yanisley Jimenez-Sanderson and Yoannia Colas-Rodriguez
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00629
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Yoannia Colas-Rodriguez, Yunaisy Garbey, Yanisley Jimenez-Sanderson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Estanislao, Maria)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Substitute Attorney Attorney Dana Jonathon Nitz and Erich N. Storm terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joshua H. Reisman in for Attorney Dana Jonathan Nitz by Defendant Lyft, Inc.. (Nitz, Dana)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Lyft, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/10/2021.(Nitz, Dana) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/16/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/1/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 16, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRS)
April 16, 2021 Attorney update to correct filing attorney's error in case opening: Attorneys Maria Uniza Estanislao amd Daniel E. Carvalho added for Yoannia Colas-Rodriguez, Yunaisy Garbey and for Yanisley Jimenez-Sanderson. Dana Jonathon Nitz added for Lyft, Inc. (DRS)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acceptance of Service) (Storm, Erich)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lyft, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Storm, Erich)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-21-826618-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6451087) by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Acceptance of Service, #3 Exhibit Request for Exemption, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Storm, Erich) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colas-Rodriguez et al v. Lyft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Represented By: Erich N. Storm
Represented By: Joshua H Reisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yunaisy Garbey
Represented By: Daniel E. Carvalho
Represented By: Maria Uniza Estanislao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanisley Jimenez-Sanderson
Represented By: Daniel E. Carvalho
Represented By: Maria Uniza Estanislao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yoannia Colas-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel E. Carvalho
Represented By: Maria Uniza Estanislao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?