Ross v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Aron Ross
Defendant: Calvin Johnson, Brian Williams, J. Alcock, Steve Sisolak, Ronald Oliver, Charles Daniels, Frank Dreesen, Gary Piccinini, Harold Wickham and Alfonso Alvarez
Case Number: 2:2021cv00630
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for ECF No. #8 -1 Third Amended Civil Complaint by Plaintiff Jesse Aron Ross. (SC)
May 12, 2021 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT - Court Filing Fee, by Plaintiff Jesse Aron Ross. (KR)
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 RECEIPT of Payment: $402.00, receipt number NVLAS075399. (MR)
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiff Jesse Aron Ross. (KR)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave of Court to File a Third Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Jesse Aron Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed 3rd Amended Complaint) (KR)
May 5, 2021 Filing 7 APPENDIX/Exhibits filed by Plaintiff Jesse Aron Ross. (DRM)
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Jesse Aron Ross. No changes to parties. (No leave to file a Second Amended Complaint on the docket). (AB)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by an inmate, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. (Attached for distribution to P via HDSP Law Library.) IFP/Filing fee due 6/28/2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #3 the Motion for Court Order Directing NDOC to Complete Financial Certificate is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall retain #1 -1 Plaintiff's civil rights Complaint but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Instructions/Form) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, by Jesse Aron Ross. (Additional defendants added to docket: Alfonso Alvarez, Charles Daniels, Frank Dreesen, Gary Piccinini, Harold Wickham, Ronald Oliver and Steve Sisolak) (SC)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Court Order Directing NDOC to Complete Financial Certificate, by Plaintiff Jesse Aron Ross. Responses due by 5/11/2021. (SC)
April 16, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DKJ)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Alcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Sisolak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Dreesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Piccinini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Wickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfonso Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Aron Ross
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?