Finch v. M1 Support Services, L.P.
Plaintiff: Tiawna Finch
Defendant: M1 Support Services, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00669
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers - Videoconference before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Written evaluation statements must be delivered to chambers or emailed as outlined to VCF_Chambers@nvd.uscourts.gov, not later than 4:00 p.m. 7/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 17, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #10 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 11/15/2021. Motions due by 12/15/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2022. Several of the rule citations herein are outdated or otherwise incorrect. Counsel must familiarize themselves with the current local rules, which became effective on April 17, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 17, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (DRS)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation for Assignment to Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 16, 2021 Filing 10 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant M1 Support Services, L.P.. (Walker, Holly)
June 16, 2021 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION /Notice Requesting Assignment to Early Neutral Evaluation Program by Defendant M1 Support Services, L.P.. (Walker, Holly)
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:21-cv-00669-RFB-NJK. (no image attached) (EDS)
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/24/2021. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah recuses herself in this action. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by M1 Support Services, L.P.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McClane, Lisa)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by M1 Support Services, L.P.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/1/2021.(McClane, Lisa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiawna Finch re #3 Summons Issued. M1 Support Services, L.P. served on 4/26/2021. (Hutchings, Mark)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to M1 Support Services, L.P. re #1 Complaint. (DRS)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 23, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DRS)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tiawna Finch (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6459186) by Tiawna Finch. Proof of service due by 7/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Hutchings, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finch v. M1 Support Services, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M1 Support Services, L.P.
Represented By: Lisa A McClane
Represented By: Holly E Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiawna Finch
Represented By: Mark Hutchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?