Boskovich v. Nye County District Attorney's Office et al
Plaintiff: Ronni Boskovich
Defendant: Nye County District Attorney's Office, Chris Arabia, Leo Blundo and Nye County
Case Number: 2:2021cv00670
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Ronni Boskovich. Replies due by 6/23/2021. (Balaban, Michael)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/11/2021 at 01:00 PM by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. The evaluation statements must be submitted, in an envelope marked "Confidential," directly to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe's box in the Clerk's Office not later than 3:00 PM on 8/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Chris Arabia, Leo Blundo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wilde, Kathleen)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Chris Arabia, Leo Blundo. Responses due by 6/16/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/17/2021. (Wilde, Kathleen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ronni Boskovich re #2 Summons Issued. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Summons.Signed.Arabia and Blundo) (Balaban, Michael)
April 24, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ronni Boskovich. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Balaban, Michael)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (YAW)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Defendants Chris Arabia, Leo Blundo, and Nye County re #1 Complaint. (YAW)
April 22, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (YAW)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6459239) by Ronni Boskovich. Proof of service due by 7/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Balaban, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boskovich v. Nye County District Attorney's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nye County District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Arabia
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Blundo
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nye County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronni Boskovich
Represented By: Michael P. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?