Ralph A. Schwartz, P.C. v. Snyder et al
Plaintiff: Ralph A. Schwartz, P.C.
Defendant: Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC doing business as HHRG, Valley Health System LLC doing business as Spring Valley Hospital Medical Center, Plusfour Inc., Dignity Health doing business as St. Rose Dominican Hospitals-Siena Campus, Law Offices of Stevenson, Acquisto & Coleman, Innovative Pain Care Center, Fremont Emergency Services (Scherr), Ltd., Michael Schneier Neurosurgical Consulting, P.C., Operating Engineers Local 501 Security Fund, James M Snyder, J. Paul Wiesner & Associates Chartered doing business as Radiology Associates of Nevada and Community Ambulance
Cross Defendant: Valley Health System LLC, Dignity Health, Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC and J. Paul Wiesner & Associates Chartered
Case Number: 2:2021cv00909
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Operating Engineers Local 501 Security Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (McDonald, Sean)
June 8, 2021 Filing 12 Dignity Health's ANSWER to #4 Answer to Petition for Removal,,,, Crossclaim,,,, Counterclaim,,, Answer to Crossclaim Only filed by Dignity Health.(Sullivan, Barry)
June 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Barry Sullivan on behalf of Defendant Dignity Health, Cross Defendant Dignity Health. (Sullivan, Barry)
June 7, 2021 Filing 10 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's ANSWER to #4 Answer to Petition for Removal,,,, Crossclaim,,,, Counterclaim,,, Counterclaim filed by Ralph A. Schwartz, P.C..(Schwartz, Ralph)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Petition for Removal,,,, Crossclaim,,,, Counterclaim,,, filed by Michael Schneier Neurosurgical Consulting, P.C..(Gabroy, Christian)
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ralph A. Schwartz, P.C.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Schwartz, Ralph)
May 28, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michael Schneier Neurosurgical Consulting, P.C.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gabroy, Christian)
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Michael Schneier Neurosurgical Consulting, P.C..(Gabroy, Christian)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Operating Engineers Local 501 Security Fund. (McDonald, Sean)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal(, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/1/2021.), CROSSCLAIM against Fremont Emergency Services (Scherr), Ltd., Valley Health System LLC, Dignity Health, James M Snyder, Innovative Pain Care Center, Michael Schneier Neurosurgical Consulting, P.C., Community Ambulance, Law Offices of Stevenson, Acquisto & Coleman, Plusfour Inc., Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC, J. Paul Wiesner & Associates Chartered by Operating Engineers Local 501 Security Fund., COUNTERCLAIM against Ralph A. Schwartz, P.C. by Operating Engineers Local 501 Security Fund. filed by Operating Engineers Local 501 Security Fund.(McDonald, Sean) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 5/18/2021 (EDS).
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/10/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/25/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Operating Engineers Local 501 Security Fund. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McDonald, Sean)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Case Number A-21-832300-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6480547) by Operating Engineers Local 501 Security Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Index Index of Exhibits) (McDonald, Sean) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 10, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ralph A. Schwartz, P.C. v. Snyder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC doing business as HHRG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Health System LLC doing business as Spring Valley Hospital Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plusfour Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health doing business as St. Rose Dominican Hospitals-Siena Campus
Represented By: Barry Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Stevenson, Acquisto & Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Pain Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont Emergency Services (Scherr), Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Schneier Neurosurgical Consulting, P.C.
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Kaine M. Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Operating Engineers Local 501 Security Fund
Represented By: Sean W. McDonald
Represented By: Kristina L. Hillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Paul Wiesner & Associates Chartered doing business as Radiology Associates of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Ambulance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph A. Schwartz, P.C.
Represented By: Ralph A Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Valley Health System LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Dignity Health
Represented By: Barry Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: J. Paul Wiesner & Associates Chartered
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?