Dorsett v. Mogensen et al
Plaintiff: Newton Dorsett
Defendant: ESA LTD, LLC and Brian Mogensen
Case Number: 2:2021cv00985
Filed: May 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #12 filed by attorney Jesse Ransom. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Affidavit to Summons Returned Executed. No further action is required. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed AFFIDAVIT of Service as to ESA re #5 Summons Issued, #2 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Newton Dorsett. ESA LTD, LLC served on 5/27/2021. (Ransom, Jesse) Modified event on 7/28/2021 (SLD).
July 26, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Newton Dorsett. Replies due by 8/2/2021. (Ransom, Jesse)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Defendant must file a certificate of interested parties by 8/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 19, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/19/2021. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Defendant Brian Mogensen has not done so. Accordingly, Defendant must file a certificate of interested parties no later than July 23, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JA)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/13/2021. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #7 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Brian Mogensen. Responses due by 7/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Service) (MR)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by Brian Mogensen. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/26/2021. (MR) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #2 Complaint. (MR)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for ESA LTD LLC by Plaintiff Newton Dorsett. (Ransom, Jesse)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Brian Mogensen by Plaintiff Newton Dorsett. (Ransom, Jesse)
May 24, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402) by Newton Dorsett. Proof of service due by 8/22/2021. (MR)
May 23, 2021 Filing 1 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Newton Dorsett. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ransom, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsett v. Mogensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESA LTD, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Mogensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newton Dorsett
Represented By: Jesse A. Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?