Layton v. Sunbeam Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christine Layton
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc. and Newell Brands Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00989
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 19 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Newell Brands Inc, Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Owens, Jonathan)
July 26, 2021 Filing 18 ADDENDUM to #13 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants Newell Brands Inc, Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Owens, Jonathan)
July 26, 2021 Filing 17 ADDENDUM to #14 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants Newell Brands Inc, Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Owens, Jonathan)
July 21, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/21/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #13 & #14 are DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Brent S. Moffett and Stephen T. Moffett shall provide a current Certificate of Good Standing from EACH state in which Petitioner has been admitted to practice law, in accordance with the instruction set forth on Page 2, No. 3 of the Verified Petition For Permission To Practice In This Case Only By Attorney Not Admitted To The Bar Of This Court And Designation Of Local Counsel. Petitioner's shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file the corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petition, and Petitioner will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
July 21, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/21/2021. Before the Court is the parties' "joint case management report," which the Court construes as the parties' proposed discovery plan and scheduling order. ECF No. #12 . The proposed DPSO violates the Local Rules in several respects, so it is DENIED. First, the proposed DPSO violates LR 26-1(a) because it does not indicate on its face whether it is submitted in compliance with LR 26-1(b) or whether special scheduling review is requested. Second, the deadlines proposed by the parties appear to deviate from the standard 180-day discovery period (e.g., the expert deposition deadline will not expire until July 2022) but the parties did not provide "a statement of the reasons why longer or different time periods should apply to this case." LR 26-1(a). Third, the proposed schedule permits expert disclosures after the close of fact discovery, which is a deviation from LR 26-1(b)(3), but the parties do not explain or justify this decision either. Fourth, the proposed DPSO violates LR 26-1(b)(10) because it lacks a signature block for the judge's signature. IT IS ORDERED that a new proposed DPSO is due 7/30/2021. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DCh)
July 19, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stephen T. Moffett and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6562720) by Defendants Newell Brands Inc, Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Owens, Jonathan)
July 19, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brent S. Moffett and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan Owens (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6562709) by Defendants Newell Brands Inc, Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Owens, Jonathan)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Defendants Newell Brands Inc, Sunbeam Products, Inc. (Owens, Jonathan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Newell Brands Inc, Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Owens, Jonathan)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Remove Attorney Clark Seegmiller from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/21/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to remove attorney Clark Seegmiller from the Electronic Service List in this case by Plaintiff Christine Layton. (Miles, Christian)
June 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christian A. Miles on behalf of Plaintiff Christine Layton. (Miles, Christian)
June 7, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Newell Brands Inc, Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Owens, Jonathan)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Newell Brands Inc, Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Owens, Jonathan)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal re Complaint, filed by Newell Brands Inc, Sunbeam Products, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/17/2021.(Owens, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified text on 6/2/2021 (DKJ).
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/24/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/8/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Newell Brands Inc, Sunbeam Products, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Owens, Jonathan) Modified by Clerk's Office to add Sunbeam Americas Holdings, LLC, Jarden Corporation, and Jarden LLC as interested parties on 5/24/2021 (EDS).
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-830737, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6497423) by Sunbeam Products, Inc., Newell Brands Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Owens, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 24, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Layton v. Sunbeam Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan B Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newell Brands Inc
Represented By: Jonathan B Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Layton
Represented By: Clark Seegmiller
Represented By: Christian A. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?