Sabella et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Judy Sabella and Timothy Sabella
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01016
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/14/2021. In light of the Court's #11 Order granting the parties' #10 Stipulation to Stay Case and Compel Arbitration, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report every six months, beginning on Friday January 14, 2022, addressing the status of the case and its arbitration proceedings.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation to Stay the Case and Compel Arbitration Before the American Arbitration Association. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/15/2021.; Case stayed. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Stay the Case and Compel Arbitration Before the American Arbitration Association by Plaintiffs Judy Sabella, Timothy Sabella. (Alvarez, Jorge)
June 9, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Alarie, Michelle)
June 9, 2021 Filing 8 ERRATA to Add and Terminate Attorneys by Plaintiffs Judy Sabella, Timothy Sabella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Alvarez, Jorge)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. answer due 6/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 6/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Alarie, Michelle)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jonathan A White to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 6/10/2021. (no image attached) (DRS)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified entry to remove document attached in error on 5/28/2021 (EDS).
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/27/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/11/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Corporate Parent Travel + Leisure Co. f/k/a Wyndham Destinations, Inc. for added. (Alarie, Michelle)
May 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Case Number A-21-833155-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6502974) by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Theresa Orben, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of James Ward, #4 Exhibit 1 - Contract, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Alarie, Michelle) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 27, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS)
May 27, 2021 Attorney update in case: Attorney Mark Albright,Jorge L Alvarez,Jonathan A White for Judy Sabella and Timothy Sabella added. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabella et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Sabella
Represented By: Jonathan A White
Represented By: Jorge L Alvarez
Represented By: Mark Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Sabella
Represented By: Jonathan A White
Represented By: Jorge L Alvarez
Represented By: Mark Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?