4R4 Sons, LLC et al v. Tru G Wilhelm, Inc.
Plaintiff: Horizon Kidz, LLC doing business as Kidz, Kidz, Kidz and 4R4 Sons, LLC doing business as KIDZ
Defendant: Tru G. Wilhelm, Inc. and Tru G Wilhelm, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01081
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint proposed discovery plan no laterthan 8/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 14, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs 4R4 Sons, LLC, Horizon Kidz, LLC. (Works, Ryan)
July 8, 2021 Filing 23 ERRATA to #21 Response, by Defendant Tru G Wilhelm, Inc.. (McDonnell, Patrick)
July 8, 2021 Filing 22 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Tru G Wilhelm, Inc.. (McDonnell, Patrick)
July 7, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Tru G Wilhelm, Inc.. Replies due by 7/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supp. Decl. of Wilhelm, #2 Declaration Decl. of McDonnell, #3 Exhibit Works Prior Mot. for Fees) (McDonnell, Patrick)
July 6, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Tru G Wilhelm, Inc.. (McDonnell, Patrick)
June 28, 2021 Filing 19 DECLARATION re #18 Response by Plaintiffs 4R4 Sons, LLC, Horizon Kidz, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Works, Ryan)
June 28, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs 4R4 Sons, LLC, Horizon Kidz, LLC. Replies due by 7/5/2021. (Works, Ryan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Ryan J. Works re #15 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs 4R4 Sons, LLC, Horizon Kidz, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Works, Ryan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Chrisetta Rush re #15 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs 4R4 Sons, LLC, Horizon Kidz, LLC. (Works, Ryan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs 4R4 Sons, LLC, Horizon Kidz, LLC. Responses due by 7/7/2021. (Works, Ryan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by 4R4 Sons, LLC, Horizon Kidz, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Works, Ryan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 13 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Tru G Wilhelm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1) (McDonnell, Patrick)
June 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #3 Petition for Removal,,,,,,, by Defendant Tru G Wilhelm, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1) (McDonnell, Patrick)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Tru G. Wilhelm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit attachment) (McDonnell, Patrick)
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Tru G. Wilhelm, Inc.. Responses due by 6/28/2021. (McDonnell, Patrick)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tru G. Wilhelm, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (McDonnell, Patrick)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #6 Ex Parte Motion to redact personal information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/11/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/11/2021. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Defendant has not done so. Accordingly, Defendant must file a certificate of interested parties no later than June 16, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JA)
June 10, 2021 Filing 6 EX PARTE DOCUMENT Motion to redact personal information to #3 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Tru G. Wilhelm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (McDonnell, Patrick) Modified event to a motion on 6/11/2021 (DKJ).
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/8/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/23/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 VIEW #12 corrected image re attachment 4 to First PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-834149-B, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6515228) by TRU G WILHELM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 7.1 Disclosure, #3 Index Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Ex. A - Shopping Center Lease, #5 Exhibit Ex. B - Declaration of Brett Wilhelm, #6 Exhibit Ex C. - Register of Actions and Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit Ex. C1 - Complaint (redacted), #8 Exhibit Ex. C2 - Order Shortening Time on Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, #9 Exhibit Ex. C3 - Order Shortening Time on Motion to Redact Exhibits 1 and 2, #10 Exhibit Ex. C4 - Minute Order, #11 Exhibit Ex. C5 - Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #12 Exhibit Ex. C6A - Notice of Entry of Order to Redact, #13 Exhibit Ex. C6B - Notice of Entry of Order to Redact, #14 Exhibit Ex. C7 - Notice of Posting Bond, #15 Exhibit Ex. C8 - Notice of Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, #16 Exhibit Ex. C9 - Motion to Reconsider, #17 Exhibit Ex. C10 - First Amended Complaint, #18 Exhibit Ex. C11 - Notice of Evidentiary Hearing, #19 Exhibit Ex. C12 - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration, #20 Exhibit Ex. D - Lease Termination Notice, #21 Exhibit Ex. E - Acceptance of Summons and Complaint, #22 Exhibit Ex. F - Nevada Secretary of State Entity Information for Plaintiffs, #23 Exhibit Ex. G - Nevada Secretary of State for Tru G Wilhelm, #24 Exhibit Ex. H - Limited Declaration of Patrick C. McDonnell, #25 Exhibit Ex. I - Letter dated May 24, 2021 to Plaintiffs' Counsel) (McDonnell, Patrick) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 6/20/2021 (DKJ).
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #1 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected and the filing fee was not paid. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #1 using the appropriate docket entry title "Petition Removal" and pay the filing fee. Document #1 terminated. (no image attached) (DKJ)
June 8, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 ERROR: wrong event selected and filing fee not paid. Attorney advised to refile correctly and pay the filing fee. Document #1 terminated. NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TRU G WILHELM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 7.1 Disclosure, #3 Index Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Ex. A - Shopping Center Lease, #5 Exhibit Ex. B - Declaration of Brett Wilhelm, #6 Exhibit Ex. C - Register of Actions and Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit Ex. C1 - Complaint (redacted), #8 Exhibit Ex. C2 - Order Shortening Time on Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, #9 Exhibit Ex. C3 - Order Shortening Time on Motion to Redact Exhibits 1 and 2, #10 Exhibit Ex. C4 - Minute Order, #11 Exhibit Ex. C5 - Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #12 Exhibit Ex. C6A - Notice of Entry of Order to Redact, #13 Exhibit Ex. C6B - Notice of Entry of Order to Redact, #14 Exhibit Ex. C7 - Notice of Posting Bond, #15 Exhibit Ex. C8 - Notice of Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, #16 Exhibit Ex. C9 - Motion to Reconsider, #17 Exhibit Ex. C-10 - First Amended Complaint, #18 Exhibit Ex. C11 - Notice of Evidentiary Hearing, #19 Exhibit Ex. C12 - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration, #20 Exhibit Ex. D - Lease Termination Notice, #21 Exhibit Ex. E - Acceptance of Summons and Complaint, #22 Exhibit Ex. F - Nevada Secretary of State Entity Information for Plaintiffs, #23 Exhibit Ex. G - Nevada Secretary of State for Tru G Wilhelm, #24 Exhibit Ex. H - Limited Declaration of Patrick C. McDonnell OF MCDONNELL, #25 Exhibit Ex. I - Letter dated May 24, 2021 to Plaintiffs' Counsel) (McDonnell, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 4R4 Sons, LLC et al v. Tru G Wilhelm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horizon Kidz, LLC doing business as Kidz, Kidz, Kidz
Represented By: Jane Susskind
Represented By: Ryan Jefferson Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4R4 Sons, LLC doing business as KIDZ
Represented By: Jane Susskind
Represented By: Ryan Jefferson Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tru G. Wilhelm, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick McDonnell
Represented By: Matthew D. Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tru G Wilhelm, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D. Whittaker
Represented By: Patrick McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?