White v. Johnson et al
Petitioner: Toney Anthony White, III
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Calvin Johnson
Case Number: 2:2021cv01114
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5.00, receipt number NVLAS076626 (DRS) Modified filing date on 8/2/2021 (DRS).
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Plaintiff shall either pay the filing fees in full or file a complete motion to proceed in forma pauperis on or before 8/26/2021. (IFP documents attached herein). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application and Instructions for distribution through law library)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Johnson et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:21-cv-01114. (SMR)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Part I, #2 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Part II) (SMR)
June 11, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Calvin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Toney Anthony White, III
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?