Enerkon Solar International, Inc. v. Capello et al
Plaintiff: Enerkon Solar International, Inc.
Defendant: Jeff Greeney, John V Capello, John Bauschka, Streamworx, LLC, Cathy D. Collins, Jonathan Baker, Excelsior Consultants, Inc., Vasthi Avila, Studebaker Distribution Corp, Michael Studer, Sea Friends Incorporated and Lucious Glenn
Case Number: 2:2021cv01122
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Enerkon Solar International, Inc. re #21 Summons Issued. Lucious Glenn served on 7/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Process Server) (Johnson, H.)
August 6, 2021 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Enerkon Solar International, Inc. re #2 Amended Complaint, #25 Summons Issued. Studebaker Distribution Corp served on 7/29/2021. (Johnson, H.)
August 6, 2021 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Enerkon Solar International, Inc. re #2 Amended Complaint, #18 Summons Issued. John Bauschka served on 7/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Johnson, H.)
August 6, 2021 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Enerkon Solar International, Inc. re #2 Amended Complaint, #15 Summons Issued. Cathy D. Collins served on 7/27/2021. (Johnson, H.)
August 6, 2021 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Enerkon Solar International, Inc. re #2 Amended Complaint, #23 Summons Issued. Sea Friends Incorporated served on 8/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Johnson, H.)
August 6, 2021 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Enerkon Solar International, Inc. re #2 Amended Complaint, #22 Summons Issued. Michael Studer served on 8/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Johnson, H.)
August 6, 2021 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Enerkon Solar International, Inc. re #2 Amended Complaint, #19 Summons Issued. John V Capello served on 7/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Johnson, H.)
July 28, 2021 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Enerkon Solar International, Inc. re #16 Summons Issued. Excelsior Consultants, Inc. served on 7/27/2021. (Johnson, H.)
July 28, 2021 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Enerkon Solar International, Inc. re #24 Summons Issued. Streamworx, LLC served on 7/27/2021. (Johnson, H.)
July 28, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Enerkon Solar International, Inc. re #17 Summons Issued. Jeff Greeney served on 7/26/2021. (Johnson, H.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Vasthi Avila re #2 Amended Complaint. (YAW)
July 22, 2021 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Studebaker Distribution Corp re #2 Amended Complaint. (YAW)
July 22, 2021 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Streamworx Consulting, LLC re #2 Amended Complaint. (YAW)
July 22, 2021 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Sea Friends Incorporated re #2 Amended Complaint. (YAW)
July 22, 2021 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Michael Studer re #2 Amended Complaint. (YAW)
July 22, 2021 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Lucious Glenn re #2 Amended Complaint. (YAW)
July 22, 2021 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Jonathan Baker re #2 Amended Complaint. (YAW)
July 22, 2021 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to John V Capello re #2 Amended Complaint. (YAW)
July 22, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to John Bauschka re #2 Amended Complaint. (YAW)
July 22, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Jeff Greeney re #2 Amended Complaint. (YAW)
July 22, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Excelsior Consultants, Inc. re #2 Amended Complaint. (YAW)
July 22, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Cathy D. Collins re #2 Amended Complaint. (YAW)
July 22, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Enerkon Solar International, Inc.. (Johnson, H.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Enerkon Solar International, Inc.. (Johnson, H.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Enerkon Solar International, Inc.. (Johnson, H.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Enerkon Solar International, Inc.. (Johnson, H.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Enerkon Solar International, Inc.. (Johnson, H.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Enerkon Solar International, Inc.. (Johnson, H.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Enerkon Solar International, Inc.. (Johnson, H.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Enerkon Solar International, Inc.. (Johnson, H.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Enerkon Solar International, Inc.. (Johnson, H.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Enerkon Solar International, Inc.. (Johnson, H.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Enerkon Solar International, Inc.. (Johnson, H.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Enerkon Solar International, Inc.. (Johnson, H.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Enerkon Solar International, Inc.. Adds new parties. (Johnson, H.)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6522942) by Enerkon Solar International, Inc.. Proof of service due by 9/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, H.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 14, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enerkon Solar International, Inc. v. Capello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Greeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John V Capello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bauschka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Streamworx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy D. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excelsior Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vasthi Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Studebaker Distribution Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Studer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Friends Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucious Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enerkon Solar International, Inc.
Represented By: H. Stan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?