Eroles v. Biolife Plasma, LP et al
Plaintiff: Angelo Eroles
Defendant: Biolife Plasma, L.L.C., Biolife Plasma, LP, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. and Biolife Plasma Services LP
Case Number: 2:2021cv01163
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #20 Discovery Plan; Discovery due by 2/14/2022. Motions due by 3/16/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Angelo Eroles. (Hauf, Marjorie)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Angelo Eroles. (Hauf, Marjorie)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to #14 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Angelo Eroles. (Hauf, Marjorie)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to #14 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Biolife Plasma Services LP, Biolife Plasma, L.L.C., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.. Replies due by 7/14/2021. (Hanson, John)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Biolife Plasma Services LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Statement of Removal) (Hanson, John)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Bre'Ahn Williams is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (SLD)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #14 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Marjorie L. Hauf and Bre'Ahn Williams. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Angelo Eroles. Responses due by 7/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Hauf, Marjorie)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/21/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/6/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal, (Answer to Complaint) filed by Biolife Plasma, L.L.C., Biolife Plasma, LP.(Hanson, John)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal, (Answer to Complaint) filed by Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/2/2021.(Hanson, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.. (Hanson, John)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Biolife Plasma, L.L.C., Biolife Plasma, LP. (Hanson, John)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JOINDER to #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Biolife Plasma, L.L.C.. (Hanson, John)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JOINDER to #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.. (Hanson, John)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Biolife Plasma, LP. (Hanson, John)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Biolife Plasma, LP that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited (Japan), Corporate Parent Baxalta, U.S. Inc., Corporate Parent Baxalta, Incorporated, Corporate Parent Dyax Corp., Corporate Parent Shire Pharmaceuticals International, I.C. (Ireland), Corporate Parent Shire Human Genetics Therapies, Inc., Corporate Parent Takeda Pharmaceutials USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Takeda Pharmaceuticals International AG (Switzerland) for Biolife Plasma, LP added. (Hanson, John)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Biolife Plasma, L.L.C. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited (Japan), Corporate Parent Baxalta, U.S. Inc., Corporate Parent Baxalta, Incorporated, Corporate Parent Dyax Corp., Corporate Parent Shire Pharmaceuticals International, I.C. (Ireland), Corporate Parent Shire Human Genetic Therapies, Inc. for Biolife Plasma, L.L.C. added. (Hanson, John)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Takeda Pharmaceuticals Intenational AG (Switzerland), Corporate Parent Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited (Japan), Corporate Parent Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited (Japan) for Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. added. (Hanson, John)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number a-21-831212-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6528738) by Biolife Plasma, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint) (Hanson, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eroles v. Biolife Plasma, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Eroles
Represented By: Bre'Ahn Williams
Represented By: Marjorie L. Hauf
Represented By: Matthew G Pfau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biolife Plasma, L.L.C.
Represented By: John Robert Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biolife Plasma, LP
Represented By: John Robert Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Represented By: John Robert Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biolife Plasma Services LP
Represented By: John Robert Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?