Youngblood v. NAV-LVH, LLV dba Westgate Las Vegas Resort & Casino
Plaintiff: Lakieshla Youngblood
Defendant: NAV-LVH, LLV dba Westgate Las Vegas Resort & Casino
Case Number: 2:2021cv01169
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to 10 Minute Order,,, by Defendant NAV-LVH, LLV dba Westgate Las Vegas Resort & Casino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Clark, Troy)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/13/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant NAV-LVH, LLV dba Westgate Las Vegas Resort & Casino ("Defendant") show cause as to why the Court should not remand this action to Clark County District Court for failure to satisfy the diversity jurisdiction requirements set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1332. Specifically, Defendant must show that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000.00. Defendants shall have until Thursday, August 12, 2021 to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, demonstrating that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Failure to comply with this Order will result in this case being remanded to Clark County District Court.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NY) Modified text on 7/14/2021 (EDS).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Re: #8 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #7 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/2/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendant NAV-LVH, LLV dba Westgate Las Vegas Resort & Casino. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Protective Order Affidavit, #2 Exhibit E-Signature Approval) (Clark, Troy)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lakieshla Youngblood that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Jackson, Charles)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/21/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/6/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant NAV-LVH, LLV dba Westgate Las Vegas Resort & Casino. (Clark, Troy)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by NAV-LVH, LLV dba Westgate Las Vegas Resort & Casino. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clark, Troy)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-833230-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6530281) by NAV-LVH, LLV dba Westgate Las Vegas Resort & Casino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Initial Appearance Fee Disclosures, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit Defendant's Answer, #5 Exhibit Demand for Security Resident Cost Bond, #6 Exhibit Defendant's Demand for Jury Trial, #7 Exhibit Defendant's Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Clark, Troy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 21, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Youngblood v. NAV-LVH, LLV dba Westgate Las Vegas Resort & Casino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakieshla Youngblood
Represented By: Charles S. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAV-LVH, LLV dba Westgate Las Vegas Resort & Casino
Represented By: Brandon Joseph Trout
Represented By: Troy Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?