7321 Wandering Street Trust v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: 7321 Wandering Street Trust
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC, First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC and Nevada Legal News, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01193
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to #27 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Lachman, Scott)
August 23, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #31 filed by attorney Kerry Faughnan. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Motion Miscellaneous to Motion Quash. No further action is required. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 21, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to Quash Summons on Nevada Legal News re #28 Summons Returned Executed by Defendant Nevada Legal News, LLC. Responses due by 9/4/2021. (Faughnan, Kerry) Modified event on 8/23/2021. (SLD)
August 16, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #27 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff 7321 Wandering Street Trust. Replies due by 8/23/2021. (Hong, Joseph)
August 9, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to #21 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff 7321 Wandering Street Trust. (Hong, Joseph)
August 6, 2021 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 7321 Wandering Street Trust. Nevada Legal News, LLC served on 8/2/2021. (Hong, Joseph)
August 2, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 8/16/2021. (Lachman, Scott)
August 2, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #21 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Replies due by 8/9/2021. (Lachman, Scott)
July 29, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE Setting Hearing on #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court: Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2021 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey.The hearing will be conducted using Zoom video conference. The courtroom administrator will provide counsel with the Zoom link to attend the video conference. Counsel is instructed not to forward the link to others. If additional participants need to appear, counsel is directed to contact Courtroom Administrator Danielle Cacciabaudo at danielle_cacciabaudo@nvd.uscourts.gov.For clarity of the record and best participation, the Court strongly recommends that all participants use a headset with a microphone during the hearing.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court.Members of the public may access and listen to the hearing by calling 888-808-6929 and entering access code 2178469 no later than five minutes before the scheduled hearing start time. (no image attached) (DC)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Stipulation Re: #1 Petition for Removal, Nationstar Mortgage LLC answer due 8/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 26, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) -- Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for an Extension of Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC's Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff 7321 Wandering Street Trust's Complaint by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Lachman, Scott)
July 26, 2021 Filing 22 Joint STATUS REPORT regarding Removal by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Lachman, Scott)
July 23, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff 7321 Wandering Street Trust. Responses due by 8/6/2021. (Hong, Joseph)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 20, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to remove attorney Brittany Wood, Aaron Maurice, Elizabeth Aronson from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendant First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC. (Wood, Brittany)
July 14, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held via videoconference on 7/14/2021 before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Crtrm Administrator: Danielle Cacciabaudo; Pla Counsel: Joseph Hong; Def Counsel: Scott Lachman, Elizabeth Aronson; Court Reporter: Amber McClane; Time of Hearing: 11:06 a.m. - 11:25 a.m.; Courtroom: 6D;The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel on plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 . As stated on the record, the Court GRANTS the motion #4 . Mr. Lachman's request to increase the bond is denied at this time but he can file a proper motion and the Court will address it in due course. Court adjourns.The minutes of this proceeding and the transcript will serve as the Court's official ruling. No separate written order will be issued. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 12, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/12/2021. By Deputy Clerk: Danielle Cacciabaudo. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion hearing scheduled for July 14, 2021 will now be conducted via video. The hearing will be conducted using Zoom video conference. The courtroom administrator will provide counsel with the Zoom link to attend the video conference. Counsel is instructed not to forward the link to others. If additional participants need to appear, counsel is directed to contact Courtroom Administrator Danielle Cacciabaudo at danielle_cacciabaudo@nvd.uscourts.gov. For clarity of the record and best participation, the Court strongly recommends that all participants use a headset with a microphone during the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court.Members of the public may access and listen to the hearing by calling 888-808-6929 and entering access code 2178469 no later than five minutes before the scheduled hearing start time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically #14 is DENIED as moot. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 10, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiff 7321 Wandering Street Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Hong, Joseph)
July 8, 2021 Filing 15 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Lachman, Scott)
July 7, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically, Attorney Joseph Y. Hong, re #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiff 7321 Wandering Street Trust. (Hong, Joseph)
July 7, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/7/2021. By Deputy Clerk: Danielle Cacciabaudo. Based on the trustee's request and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the trustee may appear by telephone for the hearing on 7/14/2021. All other counsel must appear in person. Counsel for the trustee is directed to call 888-808-6929, enter access code 2178469, and remain on the call until the Courtroom Administrator joins the call. The use of speakerphone or cell phone is prohibited. The call must be made using a land line. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 7, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Replies due by 7/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30) (Lachman, Scott)
July 6, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs by Plaintiff 7321 Wandering Street Trust. (Hong, Joseph)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Nationstar Mortgage LLC's Demand for Security Costs Pursuant to NRS 18.130(1) (ECF No. #9 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff 7321 Wandering Street Trust shall disclose the identities and citizenship of its trustees to Nationstar Mortgage LLC within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 7321 Wandering Street Trust shall, if it is a citizen of a state other than Nevada or is a foreign corporation, promptly post the required bond with the Court to avoid a stay of proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if 7321 Wandering Street Trust is a citizen of a state other than Nevada or a foreign corporation and fails to promptly post the required bond, Nationstar may renew a motion to stay proceedings in accordance with the statute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Demand for Security of Costs Pursuant to NRS 18.130(1) by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 7/15/2021. (Lachman, Scott)
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Cash Deposit as to 7321 Wandering Street Trust: $1,000.00, receipt number NVLAS076185 Re #7 Order. (HAM)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Shorten Time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this temporary restraining order will automatically EXPIRE at 5:00 p.m. on July 14, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Wandering Street must post a bond by the court in the amount of $1,000 by 5:00 p.m. on June 30, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Wandering Street's motion for a preliminary injunction (ECF No. #4 ) will be heard at 11:00 a.m. on July 14, 2021, in Courtroom 6D of the Lloyd D. George Federal Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Blvd. So., Las Vegas, Nevada 89101. Defendants have until noon on July 7, 2021, to file any response to the motion for preliminary injunction. Wandering Street has until noon on July 12, 2021, to file any reply. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Nonmonetary Status of First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC Pursuant to NRS 107.029 re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC. (Wood, Brittany)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Shorten Time Pursuant To LR IA 6-1 re #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiff 7321 Wandering Street Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9) (Hong, Joseph)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff 7321 Wandering Street Trust. Responses due by 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9) (Hong, Joseph)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nationstar Mortgage LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate KKR Wand Investors Corporation, Other Affiliate Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC added. (Lachman, Scott)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/24/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/9/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-832615-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6535100) by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Lachman, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 24, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 7321 Wandering Street Trust v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Scott Robert Lachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Aaron R. Maurice
Represented By: Elizabeth Aronson
Represented By: Brittany Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Legal News, LLC
Represented By: Kerry P. Faughnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 7321 Wandering Street Trust
Represented By: Joseph Y Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?