Whitesell v. Nye County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: John Tony Whitesell
Defendant: Nye County Sheriff's Office and Eric Anderson
Case Number: 2:2021cv01209
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff John Tony Whitesell. Address updated to NCDC, 1521 E. Siri Lane, Pahrump, NV, 89060. (DRS)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff John Tony Whitesell. Address updated to: Tonopah Detention Center, PO Box 831, Tonopah, NV 89049. (Clerk's Note: a public docket sheet shall be sent to P in reference to inquiry in Notice - DRS)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct [1-1] Complaint by Plaintiff John Tony Whitesell. Responses due by 8/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint) (DRS)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John Tony Whitesell. (DRS)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of previous prison number by John Tony Whitesell. (No changes made to prisoner number upon receipt of this document - DRS)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for copy of Amended Complaint by Plaintiff John Tony Whitesell. (DRS)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff John Tony Whitesell. Address updated to: Nye County Detention Center, 1521 East Siri Lane, Pahrump, NV 89060. (DRS)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, A new IFP application or payment of filing fees in full is due on or before 8/26/2021. The Court further DENIES without prejudice the #4 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff may refile the motion as outlined in the order on or before 8/27/2021. The Court also GRANTS IN PART the #5 Motion to add a second mailing address. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to both of the plaintiff's addresses at the TDC and the Nye County Detention center that he notes in his motion. Additionally, the Court GRANTS in PART the #6 Motion for copies. The Clerk shall also mail a copy of the proposed complaint filed at [1-1] to Plaintiff at both addresses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; Enclosed this order, Complaint at [1-1], new complaint form and new IFP application form, mailed to plaintiff c/o both Tonopah Detention Center and to Nye County Detention Center - DRS)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Copies by Plaintiff John Tony Whitesell. Responses due by 8/9/2021. (HAM)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Add Second Mailing Address by Plaintiff John Tony Whitesell. Responses due by 8/9/2021. (HAM)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct [1-1] Complaint by Plaintiff John Tony Whitesell. (DRS)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff John Tony Whitesell. Address updated to Tonopah Detention Center, P.O. Box 831, Tonopah, NV 89049. ( #2 resent to P and new 1983 and ifp application included as requested - DRS)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRS)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John Tony Whitesell. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DRS)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitesell v. Nye County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tony Whitesell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nye County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?