Zuniga v. Unforgettable Coatings Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jose Ismael Zuniga
Defendant: Unforgettable Coatings Inc and Unforgettable Coatings of Idaho LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01221
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal (Third Request). Defendants answer due 9/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 5, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #9 Order on Stipulation,,, by Defendants Unforgettable Coatings Inc, Unforgettable Coatings of Idaho LLC. (McChrystal, Lynne)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendants Unforgettable Coatings Inc, Unforgettable Coatings of Idaho LLC. (McChrystal, Lynne)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Unforgettable Coatings Inc and Unforgettable Coatings of Idaho LLC answer due 8/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #6 Order on Stipulation,,, by Defendants Unforgettable Coatings Inc, Unforgettable Coatings of Idaho LLC. (McChrystal, Lynne)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Unforgettable Coatings Inc, Unforgettable Coatings of Idaho LLC. (McChrystal, Lynne)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #4 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Unforgettable Coatings Incand Unforgettable Coatings of Idaho LLC answer due 7/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Unforgettable Coatings Inc, Unforgettable Coatings of Idaho LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McChrystal, Lynne)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Unforgettable Coatings Inc, Unforgettable Coatings of Idaho LLC. (McChrystal, Lynne)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jose Ismael Zuniga. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gabroy, Christian)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 6/29/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/14/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-21-835257-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6539654) by Unforgettable Coatings Inc, Unforgettable Coatings of Idaho LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (McChrystal, Lynne) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 29, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuniga v. Unforgettable Coatings Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unforgettable Coatings Inc
Represented By: Lynne McChrystal
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unforgettable Coatings of Idaho LLC
Represented By: Lynne McChrystal
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ismael Zuniga
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Kaine M. Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?