Kolterman v. Commissioner Of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kevin Keith Kolterman
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2021cv01251
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel P. Talbert on behalf of Defendant Commissioner Of Social Security. (Talbert, Daniel)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Commissioner Of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JQC)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (JQC)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (AF)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kevin Keith Kolterman. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6543862) by Kevin Keith Kolterman. Proof of service due by 9/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #3 Summons OGC, #4 Summons USAG, #5 Summons USAO) (Taylor, Hal) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 7/6/2021 (AF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kolterman v. Commissioner Of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Keith Kolterman
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?