Golia-Huffman v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sierra Golia-Huffman
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. doing business as Smith's Food & Drug Centers #332
Case Number: 2:2021cv01260
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/29/2022. Motions due by 5/30/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/29/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re 8 Minute Order,, by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Busby, Jerry)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/6/2021. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago. It has come to the attention of the Court that the parties have failed to file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order in accordance with United States District Court for the District of Nevada Local Rule 26-1. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order within 14 days of the date of this Order. The proposed plan and order shall include, if appropriate, identification of all discovery done to date and all discovery that remains to be completed. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sierra Golia-Huffman. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Roy, Eric)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Busby, Jerry)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Busby, Jerry)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/2/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/17/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fred Meyer, Inc., Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. added. (Busby, Jerry)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-833520-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6545085) by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Busby, Jerry) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 2, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golia-Huffman v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Golia-Huffman
Represented By: John T. Oblad
Represented By: Eric P Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. doing business as Smith's Food & Drug Centers #332
Represented By: Jerry S. Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?