Rhone v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Joyce Elaine Rhone
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv01296
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (SLD)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE Certified Mail Returned 7018 3090 0001 1133 1798 re #7 Certified Mail. (JQC)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Chantal Jenkins on behalf of Defendant Commissioner Of Social Security. (Jenkins, Chantal)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. Commissioner Of Social Security served on 7/16/2021. (JQC)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipts 7018 3090 0001 1133 1798 and 7018 3090 0001 1133 1804 re #5 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and the Office of the Attorney General. (DRS)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Commissioner Of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #5 Complaint. (DRS)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security by Joyce Elaine Rhone. (DRS)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: USMS - DRS)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 7/29/2021. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (SLD)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Joyce Elaine Rhone. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joyce Elaine Rhone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #4 Summons OGC, #5 Summons USAG, #6 Summons USAO) (Taylor, Hal) Modified on 7/8/2021 (SLD).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhone v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Elaine Rhone
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Represented By: Chantal Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?