Zepeda v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Maria Elisa Zepeda
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv01303
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Commissioner Of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #5 Complaint. (HAM)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security by Maria Elisa Zepeda. Proof of service due by 10/11/2021. (HAM)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #1 -2) shall proceed against Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall detach and file Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #1 -2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have sixty (60) days from the date of service to file his answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, henceforth, Plaintiff shall serve upon Defendant a copy of every pleading, motion, or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (DKJ)
July 12, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DKJ)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Maria Elisa Zepeda. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Maria Elisa Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #4 Summons OGC, #5 Summons USAG, #6 Summons USAO). (Taylor, Hal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zepeda v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elisa Zepeda
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?