Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund v. Tope et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund
Defendant: Cynthia A Tope and Pamela J Tope
Case Number: 2:2021cv01323
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Order on Motion for Service by Publication, addressed to Cynthia A. Tope. RTS, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. (HAM)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Service by Publication. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to add the last known address of Cynthia A. Tope to the civil docket and send a copy of this Order to: ATTN: Cynthia A. Tope, Delmonico Apartments, 4370 S. Highland Dr., Holladay, UT 84124. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/13/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc mailed to Cynthia Tope - HAM)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Service by Publication with Proposed Order by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund. (Martin, Daryl)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Pamela J Tope on 7/22/2021 executed by Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund. (Martin, Daryl)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cynthia A Tope, Pamela J Tope re #1 Complaint (HAM)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Martin, Daryl)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cynthia A Tope, Pamela J Tope (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6556136) by Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund. Proof of service due by 10/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Martin, Daryl) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 13, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund v. Tope et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia A Tope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela J Tope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?