Pamintuan v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Alexander Pamintuan
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01365
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael B Bernacchi for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael R Brooks. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/7/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael B. Bernacchi and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael R. Brooks (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6622430) by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Brooks, Michael)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company answer due 9/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Michael B. Bernacchi to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/8/2021. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (First Request) TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S #1 COMPLAINT, by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Brooks, Michael) Modified on 8/25/2021 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD).
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander Pamintuan re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 8/9/2021. (Mersch, Julie)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. (MR)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Alexander Pamintuan. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mersch, Julie)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6564844) by Alexander Pamintuan. Proof of service due by 10/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Mersch, Julie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 20, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pamintuan v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Pamintuan
Represented By: Julie A. Mersch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael R Brooks
Represented By: Michael Bernard Bernacchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?