Russo v. Duracell Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Russo
Defendant: Duracell Inc. and Sennheiser Electric Corp.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01403
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 8/18/2022. Motions due by 9/19/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 23, 2021 Filing 17 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Duracell Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce)
August 18, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Remove Document Number 13 From the Court's Docket by Defendant Duracell Inc.. Responses due by 9/1/2021. (Dickinson, Bruce)
August 18, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to #3 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Duracell Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce)
August 18, 2021 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT Pursuant to the Court Minute Order Dated July 27, 2021 by Defendant Duracell Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce)
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #3 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Duracell Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce)
August 11, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #3 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Michael Russo. Replies due by 8/18/2021. (Stucki, Kyle)
August 9, 2021 Filing 11 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Duracell Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sennheiser Electric Corp. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Sennheiser Electronic GmbH & Co. KG, Corporate Parent Sennheiser V + V GmbH & Co. KG for added. (Rich, Jonathan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE re #8 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by attorney Jonathan Rich. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) which have a direct pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case.Attorney advised to refile the Certificate of Interested, making sure to add any interested parties. Document #8 terminated. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 ERROR: Document terminated. Attorney to refile listing Interested Parties. CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sennheiser Electric Corp. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Rich, Jonathan) Modified on 8/4/2021 (SLD).
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 JOINDER to #3 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Sennheiser Electric Corp.. (Rich, Jonathan)
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michael Russo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Stucki, Kyle)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/27/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/11/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Duracell Inc.. Responses due by 8/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Dickinson, Bruce)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Duracell Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent The Duracell Company, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Duracell Inc. added. (Dickinson, Bruce)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-832494-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6572276) by Duracell Inc.. Proof of service due by 7/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dickinson, Bruce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 27, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russo v. Duracell Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Russo
Represented By: Kyle A Stucki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duracell Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Scott Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sennheiser Electric Corp.
Represented By: Jonathan Rich
Represented By: Michael R. Hall
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?