Securities and Exchange Commission v. Shustek et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Michael V. Shustek and Vestin Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01416
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Michael V. Shustek and Vestin Mortgage LLC answer due 11/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Manuel A. Abascal and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark A. Hutchison (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6639716) by Defendants Michael V. Shustek, Vestin Mortgage LLC. (Hutchison, Mark)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to #1 Complaint, by Defendants Michael V. Shustek, Vestin Mortgage LLC. (Hutchison, Mark) Modified on 9/22/2021 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD).
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Vestin Mortgage LLC waiver sent on 7/29/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (Zhou, David)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Michael V. Shustek waiver sent on 7/29/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (Zhou, David)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Michael V. Shustek, Vestin Mortgage LLC. (JQC)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael V. Shustek, Vestin Mortgage LLC by Securities and Exchange Commission. Proof of service due by 10/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Michael V. Shustek, #3 Summons Vestin Mortgage LLC) (Hawley, Ruth) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 29, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Shustek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Ruth Landis Hawley
Represented By: David Zhou
Represented By: Erin Schneider
Represented By: Jeremy Pendrey
Represented By: Marc David Katz
Represented By: Monique C. Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael V. Shustek
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vestin Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?