Ossowski v St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Defendant: Joan Ossowski, St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center, LLC dba St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation dba St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center and St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center, LLC doing business as St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center
Case Number: 2:2021cv01417
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #16 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/27/2022. Motions due by 7/27/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/26/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/20/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 17, 2021 Filing 16 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy)
September 17, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/17/2021. IT IS ORDERED that the parties must file a joint proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by 9/27/2021. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:21-cv-01417-JCM-BNW. (no image attached) (YAW)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe recuses himself/herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
August 25, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (YAW)
August 24, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Joan Ossowski. (Thomas, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center, LLC. Replies due by 8/24/2021. (Thompson, Jeremy)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Joan Ossowski. Replies due by 8/23/2021. (Thomas, Andrew)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center, LLC. Responses due by 8/20/2021. (Thompson, Jeremy)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Joan Ossowski. Responses due by 8/18/2021. (Thomas, Andrew)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Joan Ossowski. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Thomas, Andrew)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 ERRATA to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Thompson, Jeremy)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE of Violation of Federal Rule 28:1446 and Attorney Action Required re: #1 Petition for Removal - ERROR: State Court Complaint attached is for the wrong State case. CORRECTION: Attorney Jeremy Thompson is advised to file the correct State Court Complaint using the event Errata in accordance with Federal Rule 28:1446(a) and LR IC 2-2(c). Additionally, attorney advised to properly link newly filed Errata to #1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). (no image attached) (SLD)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center, LLC dba St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation dba St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent BQ Operations Holdings, LLC for St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center, LLC dba St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation dba St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center added. (Thompson, Jeremy)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/29/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/13/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
July 29, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (YAW)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-21-836657-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6576356) by St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center, LLC dba St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation dba St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Jeremy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ossowski v St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Ossowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center, LLC dba St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation dba St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Jeremy J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center, LLC doing business as St. Joseph Transitional Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Jeremy J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?