Pfeffer v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Pamela Pfeffer
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01428
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jack M. Englert, Jr. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jenapher Lin. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/13/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jack M. Englert, Jr. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jenapher Lin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6627605) by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Lin, Jenapher)
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jack M. Englert, Jr. to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/6/2021. (no image attached) (EDS)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Hartford Life, Inc., Other Affiliate Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company added. (Lin, Jenapher)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/7/2021.(Lin, Jenapher) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Pfeffer re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 8/9/2021. (Mersch, Julie)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew T. Maloney for Pamela Pfeffer and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/3/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marie E. Casciari for Pamela Pfeffer and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/3/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matthew T. Maloney and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Julie A. Mersch (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6580006) by Plaintiff Pamela Pfeffer. (Mersch, Julie)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marie E. Casciari and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Julie A. Mersch (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6580004) by Plaintiff Pamela Pfeffer. (Mersch, Julie)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company re #1 Complaint (HAM)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pamela Pfeffer. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mersch, Julie)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6577570) by Pamela Pfeffer. Proof of service due by 10/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Mersch, Julie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 30, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfeffer v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Pfeffer
Represented By: Julie A. Mersch
Represented By: Marie Erin Casciari
Represented By: Matthew Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Represented By: Jenapher Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?