Securities and Exchange Commission v. Live Ventures Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: JanOne Inc., John Isaac, Live Ventures Incorporated, Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc., Jon Isaac, Kingston Diversified Holdings, LLC and Virland A. Johnson
Case Number: 2:2021cv01433
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marshall A. Camp and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christopher R. Miltenberger (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6650726) by Defendants John Isaac, Live Ventures Incorporated. (Miltenberger, Christopher)
September 30, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John C. Hueston and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christopher R. Miltenberger (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6650679) by Defendants John Isaac, Live Ventures Incorporated. (Miltenberger, Christopher)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. John B Bulgozdy withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Admit Government Attorney Jennifer Chun Barry for Securities and Exchange Commission. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 9, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John B. Bulgozdy for Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John)
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Admit Government Attorney Jennifer Chun Barry by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John)
August 10, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Kingston Diversified Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Bulgozdy, John)
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Virland A. Johnson waiver sent on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Bulgozdy, John)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. JanOne Inc. waiver sent on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Bulgozdy, John)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. John Isaac waiver sent on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Bulgozdy, John)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Live Ventures Incorporated waiver sent on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Bulgozdy, John)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Government Attorney Wendy Pearson. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/6/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Admit Government Attorney Robert Stillwell. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Admit Government Attorney John B. Bulgozdy. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/6/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Admit Government Attorney Wendy Pearson by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Admit Government Attorney Robert Stillwell by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Admit Government Attorney John B. Bulgozdy by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JanOne Inc. (f/k/a Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc.), John Isaac a/k/a Jon Isaac, Virland A. Johnson, Kingston Diversified Holdings, LLC, Live Ventures Incorporated by Securities and Exchange Commission. Proof of service due by 10/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Live Ventures, Inc., #3 Summons JanOne, Inc. f/k/a American Recycling Centers of America, Inc., #4 Summons John Isaac a/k/a Jon Isaac, #5 Summons Kingston Diversified Holdings, LLC, #6 Summons Virland A. Johnson) (Bulgozdy, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 2, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Live Ventures Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JanOne Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Isaac
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Ventures Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Isaac
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingston Diversified Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virland A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: John B Bulgozdy
Represented By: Robert Stillwell
Represented By: Wendy Pearson
Represented By: Jennifer Chun Barry
Represented By: Robert Carl Stillwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?