Sandhu v. Sidhu
Plaintiff: Puran Sandhu
Defendant: Bhajan Sidhu doing business as Smoke 4 U
Case Number: 2:2021cv01435
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Bhajan Sidhu. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/24/2021.(List Kheel, Allison) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Bhajan Sidhu answer due 9/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time (First Request) to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint, by Defendant Bhajan Sidhu. (McClane, Lisa)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Puran Sandhu. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Balaban, Michael)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bhajan Sidhu re #1 Complaint. (MR)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BHAJAN SIDHU dba SMOKE 4 U (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6579436) by PURAN SANDHU. Proof of service due by 10/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Balaban, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 2, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandhu v. Sidhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puran Sandhu
Represented By: Michael P. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhajan Sidhu doing business as Smoke 4 U
Represented By: Allison List Kheel
Represented By: Lisa A McClane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?