Naessens v. Palmer
Plaintiff: Michael Gerard Naessens and CPA, MBA Michael Gerard Naessens
Defendant: Chris Palmer
Case Number: 2:2021cv01440
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE Setting Hearing on #5 MOTION To Lift Default, #6 MOTION to Dismiss, and #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motions Hearing set for 10/13/2021 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey.The hearing will be conducted using Zoom video conference. The courtroom administrator will provide counsel listed on the docket with the Zoom link to attend the video conference. Counsel is instructed not to forward the link to others. If additional participants need to appear, counsel is directed to contact Courtroom Administrator Danielle Cacciabaudo at danielle_cacciabaudo@nvd.uscourts.gov. Members of the public may access and listen to the hearing by calling 888-808-6929 and entering access code 2178469 no later than five minutes before the scheduled hearing start time. For clarity of the record and best participation, the Court strongly recommends that all participants use a headset with a microphone during the hearing. Photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings is strictly prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Counsel is reminded that this is a formal court proceeding and that proper courtroom attire is expected. (no image attached) (DC)
September 20, 2021 Filing 22 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Michael Gerard Naessens. (MR)
September 19, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE : Notice is hereby given that Michael G. Naessens is now, and will continue to be, in full compliance with the requirements of Local Rule IC 2-1 and the Electronic Filing Procedures. (DRS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2021: #1 registration form) (EDS).
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #7 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 2, 2021 Filing 19 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Chris Palmer. (Kennedy, Todd)
August 30, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Chris Palmer. Replies due by 9/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OSC Response Re: Amount In Controversey) (Kennedy, Todd)
August 30, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Chris Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OSC Response Re: Amount In Controversey) (Kennedy, Todd)
August 30, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #5 Motion, by Defendant Chris Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OSC Response Re: Amount In Controversey) (Kennedy, Todd)
August 23, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Michael Gerard Naessens. Replies due by 8/30/2021. (MR)
August 23, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Set Aside Default, by Plaintiff Michael Gerard Naessens. Replies due by 8/30/2021. (MR)
August 20, 2021 Filing 13 WRITTEN NOTICE of incorrect information in Notice of Removal MOTION to Extend Time re #5 , #6 Motions (First Request), filed by Plaintiff Michael Gerard Naessens. (MR) Corrected docket text on 8/23/2021 (AF).
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Chris Palmer. (Kennedy, Todd)
August 18, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #4 Order to Show Cause by Defendant Chris Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration Segal Declaration) (Kennedy, Todd)
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Chris Palmer. (Kennedy, Todd)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Plaintiff Michael Gerard Naessens. (MR)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Michael Gerard Naessens. Responses due by 8/30/2021. (MR)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically by Plaintiff Michael Gerard Naessens. (MR)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Chris Palmer. Responses due by 8/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Article, #3 Declaration Palmer Declaration, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #5 Declaration Segal Declaration, #6 Exhibit Notice of Special Appearance, #7 Exhibit Default) (Kennedy, Todd)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION To Lift Default by Defendant Chris Palmer. Responses due by 8/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Article, #3 Declaration Palmer Declaration, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #5 Declaration Segal Declaration, #6 Exhibit Notice of Special Appearance, #7 Exhibit Default) (Kennedy, Todd)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant is hereby ORDERED to show cause in writing, by 8/18/2021, why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/3/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/18/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Chris Palmer that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Kennedy, Todd)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-829745-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6580288) by Chris Palmer. Proof of service due by 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Removal Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Removal Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Removal Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Removal Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kennedy, Todd) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 3, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naessens v. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gerard Naessens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CPA, MBA Michael Gerard Naessens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Palmer
Represented By: Ketan Bhirud
Represented By: Todd E. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?