De Leon v. Delacan, LLC
Plaintiff: Edward De Leon
Defendant: Delacan, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01445
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Stipulation to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (Second Request). Delacan, LLC answer due 10/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 16, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Second Request) re #16 Order on Stipulation, by Defendant Delacan, LLC. (List Kheel, Allison)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #15 Stipulation to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Delacan, LLC answer due 9/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Delacan, LLC. (List Kheel, Allison)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lori M Griffin for Edward De Leon and approving Designation of Local Counsel Esther C Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alanna Klein Fischer for Edward De Leon and approving Designation of Local Counsel Esther C Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anthony J Lazzaro for Edward De Leon and approving Designation of Local Counsel Esther C Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 17, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lori M. Griffin and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Esther C. Rodriguez (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6599226) by Plaintiff Edward De Leon. (Rodriguez, Esther)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alanna Klein Fischer and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Esther C. Rodriguez (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6599219) by Plaintiff Edward De Leon. (Rodriguez, Esther)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anthony J. Lazzaro and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Esther C. Rodriguez (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6599193) by Plaintiff Edward De Leon. (Rodriguez, Esther)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Don J. Foty for Edward De Leon and approving Designation of Local Counsel Esther C Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/5/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #6 . Document not on Court approved form. The form is available on the Court's website: www.nvd.uscourts.govAttorney Esther Rodriguez is advised to file the corrected image using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #6 . Do not use the event "Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition" as it will charge the filer another $250. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Don J. Foty and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Esther C. Rodriguez (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6583369) by Plaintiff Edward De Leon. (Rodriguez, Esther)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Edward De Leon. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rodriguez, Esther)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Alanna Klein Fischer, Anthony J Lazzaro, Don J. Foty, and Lori M Griffin to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/17/2021. (no image attached) (MR)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Delacan, LLC re #1 Complaint. (MR)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Delacan, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6581594) by Edward De Leon. Proof of service due by 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Rodriguez, Esther) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 3, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Leon v. Delacan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward De Leon
Represented By: Alanna Klein Fischer
Represented By: Anthony J Lazzaro
Represented By: Don J. Foty
Represented By: Lori M Griffin
Represented By: Esther C Rodriguez
Represented By: Lori Marie Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delacan, LLC
Represented By: Allison List Kheel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?