U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. and Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01454
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Stipulation Re: #16 Amended Complaint. Defendants' answers due 11/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 30, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #16 Amended Complaint,, by Defendants Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
September 21, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Stay Case by Defendants Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Sinclair, Kevin)
September 20, 2021 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company by U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit) (Dragon, Lindsay)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Stipulation; Re: #1 Complaint within Petition for Removal - Defendants' answers are due 10/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 15, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust. Replies due by 9/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Dragon, Lindsay)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation Re: #6 Motion to Stay Case. Responses due by 9/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #6 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust. (Dragon, Lindsay)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation Re: #6 Motion to Stay Case. Responses due by 9/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/31/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #6 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust. (Robbins, Lindsay)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Case by Defendants Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendants Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal (First Request). Fidelity National Title Insurance Company answer due 9/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin) Modified on 8/13/2021 (SLD).
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent FNTG HOLDINGS, LLC for Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company added. (Sinclair, Kevin)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 8/5/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/20/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County, Case Number A-21-838494-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6584122) by Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 10/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) (Gizer, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 5, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Lindsay Dragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?